EP2108898 - Attachment system for solar modules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HaWi Energietechnik AG Im Gewerbepark 10 84307 Eggenfelden / DE | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoger, Klaus Lichtenberg 31 84307 Eggenfelden / DE | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Rothkopf, Ferdinand Rothkopf Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 25 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Rothkopf, Ferdinand Rothkopf Theobald Elbel Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008609.3 | 07.05.2008 | [2009/42] | Priority number, date | FR20070006042 | 29.08.2007 Original published format: FR 0706042 | [2009/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2108898 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/04, F24J2/52, H01L31/042 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
H02S20/23 (EP);
F24S20/67 (EP);
F24S25/33 (EP);
F24S25/40 (EP);
H02S20/25 (EP);
Y02A30/60 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2010/25] |
Former [2009/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Befestigungssystem für Solarmodule | [2009/42] | English: | Attachment system for solar modules | [2009/42] | French: | Système de fixation pour modules solaires | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2009/42] | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/27] | 15.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE202007016011U (MEIER CHRISTIAN [CH]) [X] 1-4,8,10,11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 7,9,14; | [Y]DE202005003717U (IBC SOLAR AG [DE]) [Y] 7,14 * paragraph [0027]; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]EP1310747 (UBBINK NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-8 *; | [X]JP2002030774 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-6,8,10-13 * abstract *; | [X]JP2000303638 (YODOGAWA STEEL WORKS) [X] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]DE202007012020U (METZGER HERBERT H W [DE]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * | [X] - ENERGIEBÜRO AG, "MONTAVENT - A FLEX", Zürich, (20070829), URL: http://www.montavent.ch/pdf/montavent_systembeschrieb_aufdach_flex.pdf, (20081027), XP002501358 [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12,14 * page 1 - page 4; figures 2,5 * | by applicant | DE202007016011U |