Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2009120 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2013 | B1 | EP2009120 | 19.08.2009 | A3 | EP2009120 | 31.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102007030207 | 27.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102007030207 | 02.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007030207 | 27.06.2007 |