EP2009120 - Use of an extremely resistant steel alloy for producing steel pipes with high resistance and good plasticity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler Deutschland GmbH Residenzstr. 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH Elsener Strasse 95 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2013/18] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Benteler Deutschland GmbH Reisedenzstr. 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | ||
For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH Elsener Strasse 95 33102 Paderborn / DE | |||
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Benteler Deutschland GmbH Reisedenzstr. 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | ||
For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH Residenzstrasse 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | |||
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states BENTELER STAHL/ROHR GMBH Residenzstr.1 33104 Paderborn / DE | ||
For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH Residenzstrasse 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diekmann, Uwe, Dr.-Ing. Pontanusstrasse 106 33102 Paderborn / DE | 02 /
Frehn, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. Pfarrer-Kunders-Strasse 19 33129 Delbrück / DE | 03 /
Redenius, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Ükern 26 33098 Paderborn / DE | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2013/18] |
Former [2009/01] | Griepenstroh, Jörg Patentanwälte Bockermann, Ksoll Griepenstroh, Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011681.7 | 27.06.2008 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | DE20071030207 | 27.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007030207 | [2009/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2009120 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2009/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2009120 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2009120 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/08, C22C38/28, C22C38/32 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP);
C21D8/10 (EP);
C22C38/42 (EP);
C22C38/44 (EP);
C22C38/48 (EP);
C22C38/50 (EP);
C22C38/58 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer hochfesten Stahllegierung zur Herstellung von Stahlrohren mit hoher Festigkeit und guter Umformbarkeit | [2009/01] | English: | Use of an extremely resistant steel alloy for producing steel pipes with high resistance and good plasticity | [2009/01] | French: | Utilisation d'un alliage d'acier très solide destiné à la fabrication de tuyaux en acier très résistants et ayant une bonne déformabilité | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2008 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | HR | 01.05.2013 | IT | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | LV | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | MT | 01.05.2013 | NL | 01.05.2013 | PL | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | AT | 27.06.2013 | IE | 27.06.2013 | LU | 27.06.2013 | BE | 30.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | FR | 01.07.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | GB | 01.08.2013 | NO | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
AT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GB | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
AT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GB | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
AT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GB | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GB | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003047258 (SAKATA KEI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0021] - [0028]; claims 1-4; tables 1,2 *; | [X]JP2003342687 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0576107 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH11279693 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0940476 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP] JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-23; tables 7-9 *; | [A]US2004050445 (OHGAMI MASAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-15; tables 1-6 *; | [A]US2003196735 (SUGIURA NATSUKO [JP] ET AL SUGIURA NATSUKO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-22 * | [X] - KATSUMATA M ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF HIGH STRENGTH AND HIGH TOUGHNESS LOW CARBON - LOW ALLOY STEEL FOR HOT FORGED PARTS", KOBELCO TECHNOLOGY REVIEW, KOBE STEEL, KOBE, JP, (19910601), no. 11, ISSN 0913-4794, pages 29 - 32, XP001038795 [X] 1-6 * figures 1-3; example C; table 1 * | Examination | EP2050833 |