Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2051303

EP2051303 - Method to detect poor infrared rays, Microchip that is able to detect poor infrared rays and apparatus working with these microchips [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2017Deletion: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomimetics Technologies Inc.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, ON M6S 2X4 / CA
[2017/27]
Former [2009/17]For all designated states
Biomimetics Technologies Inc.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto ON M6S 2X4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Gille, Christoph
Ferdinand-Lasalle-Str. 15
16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE
02 / Holmes, Chris
Albrechtstr. 14
42105 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Israelowitz, Meir
Unit 101, 6 Fernwood Gardens
Toronto, Ontario M4K 2X4 / CA
04 / Rizvi, Syed W. H.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
05 / P.Von Schroeder, Herbert
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
 [2009/36]
Former [2009/34]01 / Gille, Christoph
Ferdinand-Lasalle-Str. 15
16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE
02 / Holm, Chris
Albrechtstr. 14
42105 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Israelowitz, Meir
Unit 101, 6 Fernwood Gardens
Toronto, Ontario M4K 2X4 / CA
04 / Rizvi, Syed W. H.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
05 / P.Von Schroeder, Herbert
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
Former [2009/32]01 / Gille, Christoph
Ferdinand-Lasalle-Str. 15
16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE
02 / Holmes, Chris
Albrechtstr. 14
42105 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Israelowitz, Meir
Unit 101, 6 Fernwood Gardens
Toronto, Ontario M4K 2X4 / CA
04 / Rizvi, Syed W. H.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
05 / P.Von Schroeder, Herbert
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
Former [2009/23]01 / Gille, Christoph
Ferdinand-Lasalle-Str. 15
16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE
02 / Holmes, Chris
Albrechtstr. 14
42105 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Israelowitz, Meir
Unit 101, 6 Fernwood Gardens
Toronto, Ontario M4K 2X4 / CA
04 / Rizvi, Syed W. H.
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
05 / Von Schroeder, Herbert P
191 Ellis Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M6S 2X4 / CA
Representative(s)Jabbusch, Matthias , et al
Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Roscherstrasse 12
30161 Hannover / DE
[2014/42]
Former [2014/25](deleted)
...
Former [2009/17]Junius, Walther
Wolfstrasse 24
D-30519 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date08013302.824.07.2008
[2009/17]
Priority number, dateUS2007089580028.08.2007         Original published format: US 895800
[2009/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2051303
Date:22.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2051303
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2051303
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/0203, H01L31/0352, A61B5/00
[2009/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/35]
Former [2009/17]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erkennung schwacher Infrarotstrahlen, zur Erkennung von schwachen Infrarotstrahlen fähiger Mikrochip und Vorrichtung mit diesen Mikrochips[2009/17]
English:Method to detect poor infrared rays, Microchip that is able to detect poor infrared rays and apparatus working with these microchips[2009/17]
French:Procédé pour détecter les faibles rayons infrarouges, micro-puce qui est capable de détecter les faibles rayons infrarouges et appareil fonctionnant avec ces micro-puces[2017/15]
Former [2009/17]Procédé pour détecter les mauvais rayons infrarouges, micro-puce qui est capable de détecter les mauvais rayons infrarouges et appareil fonctionnant avec ces micro-puces
Examination procedure29.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
23.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
12.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
15.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2017Fee for grant paid
27.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2017
Request for further processing for:The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor
17.06.2009Request for further processing filed
17.06.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
01.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
15.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
07.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201003   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2011
31.07.201306   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2013
31.07.201407   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US5561295  (JACKSEN NIELS F [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6,11 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 17; figure 2 * * column 6, lines 45-65 *;
 [A]US5900631  (SANO MASAHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 9, line 48 - column 10, line 31; figures 3a,3b *;
 [A]GB1568958  (MULLARD LTD) [A] 1-6 * figure 12; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1267399  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0010] , [ 0153] - [0160]; figures 7,11 *;
 [A]US5880510  (COCKRUM CHARLES A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * columns 2,3; figure 1 *;
 [AP]US2007213617  (BERMAN HERBERT L [US], et al) [AP] 1,6 * the whole document *
 [A]  - J. F. SILIQUINI ET AL, "Two-dimensional infrared focale plane arrays based on HgCdTe photoconductive detectors", SEMICONDUCTOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (19960830), vol. 11, pages 1906 - 1911, XP002731480 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0268-1242/11/12/024
 [A]  - NORTON P, "HgCdTe infrared detectors", OPTO-ELECTRONICS REVIEW, WARSZAWA, PL, vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 1230-3402, (20021101), pages 159 - 174, URL: http://www.wat.edu.pl/review/optor/10(3)159.pdf, (20100903), XP002599143 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *