Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
12.01.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.12.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.07.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
20.07.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
19.06.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
10.04.2009 | First examination report | |
04.04.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.02.2009 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
17.10.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
09.09.2008 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
09.09.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |