EP1992805 - Reciprocating machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mason, David John Marieroalleen 9 4017 Stavanger / NO | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Hendry, Niall James Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Hendry, Niall James Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08014598.0 | 30.11.2005 | [2008/47] | Priority number, date | GB20040026228 | 30.11.2004 Original published format: GB 0426228 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992805 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02B41/02, F02B75/32, F02B41/04 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
F02M63/00 (EP,US);
F01L1/38 (EP,US);
F01L9/20 (EP,US);
F02B33/04 (EP,US);
F02B33/44 (EP,US);
F02B75/048 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Title | German: | Kolbenmaschinen | [2008/47] | English: | Reciprocating machine | [2008/47] | French: | Machine à mouvement alternatif | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05819186.7 / EP1819912 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191025470 (WALTHER SCHMIED [CH]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 27 - line 55 *; | [A]FR804164 (MYARD) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2266753 (SANDERS TREVOR GEORGE [GB]) [A] 1-13 * page 2 *; | [A]WO0058612 (BRESLAND C N [AU]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 1 - line 7; figure 8 *; | [A]US6145394 (SFERCO RUBEN JUAN [AR]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]US2004159291 (SCHMIED WALTER [US]) [A] 1 * figures 50-55 * |