Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
30.09.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.09.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.09.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
22.01.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |