Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2318664 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2016 | B1 | EP2318664 | 11.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP59126 | 16.07.2009 | EP09807919 | 16.07.2009 | EP08014872 | 21.08.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010020487 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08014872 | 21.08.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2157284 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08014872 | 21.08.2008 |