EP2157284 - Gas turbine assembly with a non-cylindrical transition duct and method for guiding the flow onto the turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Botzen, Andre Timpenstrasse 24 46117 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Klein, Karl, Dr. Dixbäume 63b 45257 Essen / DE | 03 /
Link, Marco Sternbuschweg 39 47057 Duisburg / DE | 04 /
Lüsebrink, Oliver, Dr. An der Wabeck 37 58456 Witten / DE | 05 /
Savilius, Nicolas Lohstrasse 131 45359 Essen / DE | 06 /
Schneider, Oliver, Dr. Mozartstrasse 36 46487 Wesel / DE | 07 /
Tertilt, Marc Balkhauser Weg 53 45529 Hattingen / DE | [2010/08] | Application number, filing date | 08014872.9 | 21.08.2008 | [2010/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157284 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/02 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
F01D9/023 (EP);
F05D2210/43 (EP);
F05D2230/80 (EP);
F05D2240/12 (EP);
F05D2250/313 (EP);
F05D2250/33 (EP);
F05D2250/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/43] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gasturbinenanordnung mit nichtzylindrischer Innengehäusenabe und Verfahren zur Turbinenanströmung | [2010/08] | English: | Gas turbine assembly with a non-cylindrical transition duct and method for guiding the flow onto the turbine | [2010/08] | French: | Dispositif de turbine à gaz avec conduit de transition non cylindrique et procédé pour diriger l'écoulement sur la turbine | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3117515 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11 * page 11, line 33 - page 12, line 17 * * page 15, lines 9-24 * * figures 1,2,4,6 * * abstract *; | [X]GB2361302 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11 * page 1, lines 9-12 * * page 6, lines 2-9 * * page 6, lines 31-35 * * page 9, lines 17-20 * * figures 1-6 * * abstract *; | [XA]GB2293232 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * figure 2 * [A] 2-10 |