EP2192562 - Emergency door control device and door system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASSA ABLOY Sicherheitstechnik GmbH Bildstockstrasse 20 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rotenhagen, Ulrich Mühlesteigstrasse 30 72548 Albstadt / DE | 02 /
Ammann, Peter Vorderwies 6 72406 Bisingen / DE | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Lang, Friedrich, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Lang, Friedrich, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020572.7 | 26.11.2008 | [2010/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2192562 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G08B7/00, E05B65/10, A62B3/00, // E05F15/20, G07C9/00 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
A62B3/00 (EP);
E05F15/00 (EP);
E05F15/72 (EP);
E05Y2400/814 (EP);
E05Y2400/816 (EP);
E05Y2400/85 (EP);
G07C9/37 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | Fluchttürsteuerungsgerät und Türsystem | [2010/22] | English: | Emergency door control device and door system | [2010/22] | French: | Appareil de commande de porte de secours et système de porte | [2010/22] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 03.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.03.2016 | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/31] | 18.03.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 31.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2665041 (IRIS PASCAL) [X] 1-16 * page 1, line 31 - page 3, line 27 * * page 5, lines 9-36 * * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 21 *; | [A]DE19631064 (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract ** column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 11 *; | [X]DE19963022 (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, lines 9-13 * * column 4, lines 30-59 * * column 6, lines 47-53 * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 33 *; | [X]US2006129407 (LEE SANG-WON [KR]) [X] 1-10,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0027] *; | [X]US2007069882 (MAHAJAN KAMAL [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0034] *; | [X]US2007188307 (LAI CHENG-SHING [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0012] * | Examination | DE3115521 | US2003018478 | by applicant | FR2665041 | DE19631064 | DE19963022 | US2006129407 | DE102005001327 | US2007069882 | US2007188307 |