EP1952967 - Safety door device of injection molding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2011/08] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimura, Koichi c/o FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | 02 /
Shima, Koji c/o FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2014/49] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
Nishimura, Koichi c/o FANUC LTD, 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
02 /
Shima, Koji c/o FANUC LTD, 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08100502.7 | 15.01.2008 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | JP20070026021 | 05.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007026021 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1952967 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1952967 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/84 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
B29C45/84 (EP,US);
B22D17/20 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5173 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/16] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitstürvorrichtung für eine Spritzgießmaschine | [2008/32] | English: | Safety door device of injection molding machine | [2008/32] | French: | Dispositif de porte de sécurité d'une machine de moulage par injection | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 07.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS6436425 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [DA] 1-4 * abstract *; | [DA]JP2002187184 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [DA] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0699469 (NIIGATA ENGINEERING CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2002187184 | JPS5558321U | JPS6436425 |