Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
07.11.2014 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
29.10.2014 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
29.10.2014 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
29.10.2014 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
15.07.2014 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.01.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.01.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.01.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.01.2011 | Change - applicant | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
20.01.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.01.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.06.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
13.03.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
10.03.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.07.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
04.07.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |