EP1985694 - Microinjection apparatus, trap plate and microinjection method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Akio c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Yabuki, Akihiko c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Uchida, Daisuke c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Sakai, Satoru c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Youoku, Sachihiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/26] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
Ito, Akio c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Yabuki, Akihiko c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Uchida, Daisuke c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Sakai, Satoru c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Youoku, Sachihiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
Ito, Akio c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nak Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Yabuki, Akihiko c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nak Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Uchida, Daisuke c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nak Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Sakai, Satoru c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nak Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Youoku, Sachihiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nak Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/05] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake 5th Floor Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London, WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08103729.3 | 25.04.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | JP20070119924 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007119924 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1985694 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1985694 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/00 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
C12M35/00 (EP,US);
C12M25/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/28] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikroeinspritzvorrichtung, Fangplatte und Mikroeinspritzverfahren | [2008/44] | English: | Microinjection apparatus, trap plate and microinjection method | [2008/44] | French: | Appareil et procédé de micro-injection, et plaque de trappe | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.05.2011 | [2012/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000023657 (NAT FOOD RES) [X] 1-9,12-15 * figures 1,7-9 *; | [X]EP1182250 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9,12-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1479759 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0045] * * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0091] * * figures 1,4,7 *; | [X]US2005250197 (ANDO MORITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 10,11 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0111] ** figures 17A,17B,18,19 *; | [X]EP1683855 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0020] , [0024] * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2000023657 | EP1182250 | EP1479759 | US2005250197 | EP1683855 |