EP2044868 - Hot water runoff [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aigner, Andreas Hallaich 3 83313 Siegsdorf / DE | 02 /
Jaskolka, Robert Eibenstrasse 15 83395 Freilassing / DE | 03 /
Kramer, Siegmund Bachweg 5 83417 Kirchanschöring / DE | [2009/15] | Application number, filing date | 08105331.6 | 12.09.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | DE20071047649 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007047649 | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044868 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2044868 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/46, B05B1/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A47J31/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Title | German: | Heisswasserauslauf | [2009/15] | English: | Hot water runoff | [2009/15] | French: | Évacuation d'eau chaude | [2011/30] |
Former [2009/15] | Evacuation d'eau chaude | Examination procedure | 08.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | DK | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | HR | 03.08.2011 | HU | 03.08.2011 | IE | 03.08.2011 | IT | 03.08.2011 | LT | 03.08.2011 | LV | 03.08.2011 | MT | 03.08.2011 | NL | 03.08.2011 | PL | 03.08.2011 | RO | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | TR | 03.08.2011 | LU | 12.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | NO | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | ES | 14.11.2011 | IS | 03.12.2011 | PT | 05.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
TR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LU | 12.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
LU | 12.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
LU | 12.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE462492 (HUGO HARTMANN AKT GES) [DX] 1-3,5,9,11 * the whole document *; | [X]GB618762 (MINIMAX LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11 * page 2, lines 22-99; figure - *; | [X]WO03105644 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 5, line 7 - page 10, line 18 * * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 11; figure 7 *; | [X]WO2005058109 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,11 * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 27; figures 4a,4b *; | [X]DE202007002544U (WANG DONG LEI [CN]) [X] 1,11* paragraphs [0020] - [0023]; figure - * | by applicant | DE462492 |