EP1961737 - Indan-1,3-carbodinitrile dervatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guzman, Mark, Christopher 1215 Monterey Avenue Berkeley, CA 94707 / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Hodge, Emma Jane Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hodge, Emma Jane Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08155815.7 | 07.11.2003 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | US20020427981P | 20.11.2002 Original published format: US 427981 P | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1961737 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/47, C07C51/08, C07C61/29 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
C07C253/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07C51/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07C61/29 (KR);
C07C2602/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/30, C07C255/47 (US,EP);
C07C51/08, C07C61/29 (US,EP);
C07C51/08, C07C61/39 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Title | German: | Indan-1,3-Carbodinitril Derivate | [2008/35] | English: | Indan-1,3-carbodinitrile dervatives | [2008/35] | French: | Indan-1,3-carbodinitrile dérivés | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 14.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03758601.3 / EP1565421 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3953500 (NOGUCHI SHUNSAKU, et al) [A] 1,2 * scheme on page 2, compounds III-b and VIII; *; | [A] - P.H. MAZZOCCHI ET.AL., "SYNTHESIS AND PHARMACOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF 2,3,4,5-TETRAHYDRO-1,5-METHANO-1H-3-BENZAZEPINES", J. MED. CHEM., (1979), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 455 - 457, XP002272621 [A] 1,2 * Scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00190a020 | by applicant | US3953500 | US6410550 | US6410551 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 455 - 457 | - MAZZOCCHI, P.H., J. MED. CHEM., (1979), vol. 22, no. 4, page 455 |