23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
05.07.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
27.07.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.03.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
30.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.11.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.10.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.04.2013 |
First examination report |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2011 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
01.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
21.06.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.11.2010 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
16.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |