Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009004425 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77003507 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009113470 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US77003507 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008202327 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77003507 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2008807 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2018 | B1 | EP2008807 | 22.12.2010 | A3 | EP2008807 | 31.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US77003507 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2633393 | 03.04.2012 | C | CA2633393 | 28.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77003507 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101332689 | 31.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US77003507 | 28.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2699409T | 11.02.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US77003507 | 28.06.2007 |