EP2019248 - Portable supporting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bureka Limited Room 505, 5/F, Goodluck Industrial Centre 808 Lai Chi Kok Road Cheung Sha Wan Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Law, Hung Hi Room 505, 5/F Goodluck Industrial Centre 808 Lai Chi Kok Road Cheung Sha Wan Kowloon / CN | [2009/12] |
Former [2009/05] | 01 /
Law, Hung Hi Room 505, 5/F, Goodluck Industrial Centre 808 Lai Kowloon / CN | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/05] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08160803.6 | 21.07.2008 | [2009/05] | Priority number, date | US20070828355 | 26.07.2007 Original published format: US 828355 | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2019248 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2019248 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16M13/02, F16M11/38, // F16M11/40 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
G03B17/561 (EP,US);
F16M11/242 (EP,US);
F16M11/40 (EP,US);
F16M13/00 (EP,US);
F16M13/022 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/05] | F16M13/02, // F16M11/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tragbare Stützvorrichtung | [2009/05] | English: | Portable supporting apparatus | [2009/05] | French: | Appareil de support portable | [2009/05] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003081953 (WEI DAVID [TW]) [X] 1,2,7,13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] - paragraph [0016] * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US6487807 (KOPMAN MATT [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7,13 * figures 3-5 * * column 4, line 15 - line 52 *; | [A]US3480250 (HANKINS MAXEY A) [A] 1,2,5,7,13 * column 1, line 45 - line 62 * * figures 5,6 * |