Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
07.05.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.01.2013 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
25.01.2013 | First examination report | |
29.10.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.09.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.02.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] |
02.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.01.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
05.06.2009 | Publication of search report | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] |
29.05.2009 | Change - classification | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
27.02.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |