Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009081620 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUD20070171 | 20.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2043072 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2009 | A3 | EP2043072 | 01.04.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITUD20070171 | 20.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITUD20070171 | 21.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUD20070171 | 20.09.2007 |