EP2043072 - Training device and method for learning to drive a means of transport [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T&T Telematica E Trasporti S.r.l. Via Chiozza, 3 33050 Ruda (UD) / IT | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caltabiano, Raffaele Antonio Via E. Curiel, 75 33050, Terzo d'Aquileia (UD) / IT | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 08164680.4 | 19.09.2008 | [2009/14] | Priority number, date | IT2007UD00171 | 20.09.2007 Original published format: IT UD20070171 | [2009/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2043072 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2043072 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09B9/04, G09B9/05, G09B9/06, // G09B19/16 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
G09B9/04 (EP,US);
G09B19/167 (EP,US);
G09B9/05 (EP,US);
G09B9/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/14] | G09B9/04, // G09B19/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Title | German: | Trainingsvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Lernen des Fahrens eines Transportmittels | [2009/14] | English: | Training device and method for learning to drive a means of transport | [2009/14] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement et procédé d'apprentissage de la conduite d'un moyen de transport | [2009/14] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 28.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2365790 (BALL TIMOTHY JAMES [GB]) [X] 1-9 * pages 1-11; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO02068075 (KORZENIEWSKI ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10049124 (GOETTLING MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1-9 * figure 1; claims 13-16 * | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "ExBus: Executive Bus system", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20070526), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20070625120621/http://www.t-t.it/exbuse.htm, (20090513), XP002527688 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * |