Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7967454 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2011 | B2 | US2009080154 | 26.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007245872 | 21.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101503531B | Global Dossier | 17.03.2015 | B1 | KR20090031242 | 25.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007245872 | 21.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5504557B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2014 | B2 | JP2009075457 | 09.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007245872 | 21.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2040111 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2010 | A3 | EP2040111 | 25.03.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2007245872 | 21.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101393337 | 25.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007245872 | 21.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI470303B | 21.01.2015 | B | TW200931107 | 16.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007245872 | 21.09.2007 |