EP2040111 - Electro-optic apparatus, electro-optic apparatus mounting case and electronic equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirabayashi, Hidekazu c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Miyashita, Tomoaki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252895.1 | 29.08.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | JP20070245872 | 21.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007245872 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040111 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2040111 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, G02F1/133, H05K7/20 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
G02F1/13452 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G02F1/133382 (EP,US);
G02F1/1345 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | G02F1/13, H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/45] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrooptische Vorrichtung, elektrooptisches Vorrichtungsgehäuse und elektrooptische Ausrüstung | [2009/13] | English: | Electro-optic apparatus, electro-optic apparatus mounting case and electronic equipment | [2009/13] | French: | Appareil électro-optique, boîtier de montage de l'appareil électro-optique et équipement électronique | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 04.09.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2002048152 (KURIHARA MIKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-10 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraphs [0059] , [0072] - [0074]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 8; | [Y]JP2003015104 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 8* abstract *; | [X]US2004145052 (UENO JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9-10 * embodiments 2,6;; figures 14,15,22,23 *; | [X]US2005286228 (KIM KI-JUNG [KR]) [X] 1-3,9-10 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0065] *; | [X]US2006274252 (SON SUN-KYU [KR]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1-3 * | Examination | JP2006048019 | by applicant | JP2002366046 | JP2003015104 | JP2004252331 |