EP2055707 - Preparation of Si-Si bond-bearing compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Public University Corporation Osaka City University 3-138 Sugimoto 3-chome Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Public University Corporation Osaka City University 3-138 Sugimoto 3-chome Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakazawa, Hiroshi c/o Coordination Chemistry Laboratory Graduate School of Science Osaka City University 3-138 Sugimoto 3-chome, Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Itazaki, Masumi c/o Coordination Chemistry Laboratory Graduate School of Science Osaka City University 3-138 Sugimoto 3-chome, Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2014/08] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
Nakazawa, Hiroshi c/o Coordination Chemistry Laboratory, Graduate School of Science, Osaka City University, 3-138 Sugimoto 3-chome, Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Itazaki, Masumi c/o Coordination Chemistry Laboratory, Graduate School of Science, Osaka City University, 3-138 Sugimoto 3-chome, Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2009/19] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253572.5 | 31.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | JP20070282965 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007282965 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055707 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055707 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/08, C07F7/18 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
C07F7/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/02] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellung von Si-Si-Verbindung-enthaltende Verbindungen | [2009/19] | English: | Preparation of Si-Si bond-bearing compounds | [2009/19] | French: | Préparation de composés comportant des liaisons Si-Si | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 12.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0671487 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [X] - DIVERSI P ET AL, "Catalytic and stoichiometric reactions of tertiary silanes with [Ir(Me)2Cp*L] (Cp*=eta5-C5Me5; L=PMe3, PMe2Ph, PMePh2, PPh3) in the presence of one-electron oxidants. A unique case of Si-H, Si-C, Ir-C and P-F bonds one-step activation: crystal structure of [Ir(Ph)(SiPh2F)Cp*(PMe3)]", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (20000115), vol. 593-594, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 154 - 160, XP004185695 [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 154 - page 155; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(99)00469-6 | [DY] - BROWN-WENSLEY K A, "Formation of Si-Si bonds from Si-H bonds in the presence of hydrosilation catalysts", ORGANOMETALLICS, (198707), vol. 6, no. 7, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 1590 - 1591, XP007907160 [DY] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om00150a040 | [DY] - YAMASHITA H ET AL, "Transition Metal-Catalyzed Synthesis of Silicon Polymers", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1995), vol. 68, no. 2, ISSN 0009-2673, pages 403 - 419, XP007907159 [DY] 1-6 * Equations 2-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.68.403 | [DY] - AITKEN C ET AL, "Polymerisation of primary silanes to linear polysilanes catalysed by titanocene derivatives", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (19850108), vol. 279, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-328X, pages C11 - C13, XP007907157 [DY] 1-6 * Equation 2 * | [Y] - BRUNNER H ET AL, "Optically active transition metal complexes. 101. Catalytic hydrosilylation or hydrogenation of a coordinated site of iron [Cp'Fe(CO)(X)] fragment", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (1990), vol. 29, no. 10, ISSN 0570-0833, pages 1131 - 1132, XP009112125 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.199011311 | [Y] - LICHTENBERGER D L ET AL, "Electronic structure of transition metal-silicon bonds. Valence photoelectron spectra of (eta5-C5H5)Fe(CO)2L complexes (L=SiCl3, Si(CH3)3)", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19910410), vol. 113, no. 8, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2923 - 2930, XP009112109 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00008a021 | [Y] - RANDOLPH C L ET AL, "Photochemical reactions of (eta5- pentamethylcyclopentadienyl)dicarbonyliron alkyl and silyl complexes: reversible ethylene insertion into an iron-silicon bond and implications for the mechanism of transition-metal-catalyzed hydrosilation of alkenes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1986), vol. 108, no. 12, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 3366 - 3374, XP009112124 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00272a035 | by applicant | - ORGANOMETALLICS, (1987), vol. 6, page 1590 | - BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1995), vol. 68, page 403 | - J. ORGANOMET. CHEM., (2000), vol. 154, pages 593 - 594 | - J. ORGANOMET. CHEM., (1996), vol. 521, page 145 | - J. ORGANOMET. CHEM., (1985), vol. 279, no. C11 | - Organosilicon Chemistry, VCH, (1994), page 253 |