Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
17.01.2014 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
10.01.2014 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
16.10.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.09.2013 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
16.10.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.10.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.04.2010 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
23.02.2010 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
16.12.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.12.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
09.10.2009 | First examination report | |
08.10.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
21.08.2009 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
03.04.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |