Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7662984 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2010 | B2 | US2009112013 | 30.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007282965 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5360736B | Global Dossier | 04.12.2013 | B2 | JP2009107982 | 21.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007282965 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2055707 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2014 | B1 | EP2055707 | 06.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007282965 | 31.10.2007 |