04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
01.03.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
17.08.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
08.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
01.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
21.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
20.01.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
09.09.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
03.08.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.08.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.04.2011 |
Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.04.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.04.2011 |
Change - English title |
published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
02.03.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.01.2011 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2010 |
First examination report |
|
03.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
14.05.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
04.09.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|