Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8345633 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2013 | B2 | US2010150109 | 17.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08291190 | 12.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2197228 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2011 | B1 | EP2197228 | 16.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08291190 | 12.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE528938T | 15.10.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP08291190 | 12.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101754303B | 25.12.2013 | B | CN101754303 | 23.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08291190 | 12.12.2008 |