EP2119095 - CIPHERING METHOD USING ERROR CORRECTING CODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/47] | DATA ENCODING METHOD | ||
[2011/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAVERNIER, Cédric 8, rue Montesquieu F-94120 Fontenay S/s Bois / FR | 02 /
AIACHE, Hervé 8, rue Laëtitia et Henri Trédez F-93440 Dugny / FR | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Dudouit, Isabelle Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Dudouit, Isabelle Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/47] | Dudouit, Isabelle Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08708154.3 | 24.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008EP50815 | Priority number, date | FR20070000554 | 26.01.2007 Original published format: FR 0700554 | [2009/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008095784 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119095 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2119095 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/30 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
H04L9/304 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2209/08 (EP,KR,US);
Y04S40/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHREN MIT FEHLERKORREKTURCODES | [2011/33] | English: | CIPHERING METHOD USING ERROR CORRECTING CODES | [2011/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE CHIFFREMENT A L'AIDE DE CODES CORRECTEURS D'ERREURS | [2011/33] |
Former [2009/47] | DATENKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2009/47] | DATA ENCODING METHOD | ||
Former [2009/47] | PROCEDE DE CODAGE DE DONNEES | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 21.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2008 | AT | 22.02.2012 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | HR | 22.02.2012 | IE | 22.02.2012 | IT | 22.02.2012 | LT | 22.02.2012 | LV | 22.02.2012 | MT | 22.02.2012 | NL | 22.02.2012 | PL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | NO | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | ES | 02.06.2012 | IS | 22.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XAY] - ALABBADI M ET AL, "Integrated security and error control for communication networks using the McEliece cryptosystem", SECURITY TECHNOLOGY, 1992. CRIME COUNTERMEASURES, PROCEEDINGS. INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS 1992 INTERNATIONAL CARNAHAN CONFERENCE ON ATLANTA, GA, USA 14-16 OCT. 1992, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19921014), ISBN 0-7803-0568-X, pages 172 - 178, XP010060284 [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,8 [Y] 3,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCST.1992.253739 | [YA] - AMMAR B ET AL, "Reducible rank codes and their applications to cryptography", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200312), vol. 49, no. 12, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 3289 - 3293, XP011104664 [Y] 3 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.2003.820038 | [YA] - JAMES L. MASSEY, "The Ubiquity of Reed-Muller Codes", Melbourne, Australia, ISSN 1611-3349, (20040219), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/30q8vvg507l9g6m1/, (20070907), XP009089231 [Y] 3,7 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4-6,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45624-4_1 | [A] - ENGELBERT D. OVERBECK R. SCHMIDT A., "A Summary of McEliece Cryptosystems and their Security", CRYPTOLOGY EPRINT, Darmstadt, (20060510), pages 1 - 54, URL: http://eprint.iacr.org/2006/162.ps, (20070906), XP002449947 [A] 1-8 * paragraph [01.3] - paragraph [01.4] * * paragraph [04.2] * | by applicant | - V. M. SIDEL'NIKOV, "A public-key cryptosystem based on Re- ed-Muller codes", DISCRETE MATHEMATICS AND APPLICATIONS, (1994), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 191 - 207 | - V. M. SIDEL'NIKOV, "A public-key cryptosystem based on Reed-Muller codes", DISCRETE MATHEMATICS AND APPLICATIONS, vol. 4, no. 3, pages 191 - 207 |