21.07.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
09.05.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.04.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
04.04.2017 |
Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.10.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.05.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
27.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
25.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
27.11.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
12.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|