EP2137440 - IMPROVED FLOW DIVIDER FOR HYDRAULIC CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Progressive IP Limited 38c Northway Street Te Rapa Hamilton 3421 / NZ | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARP, Rodney Warwick 23 Thompson Avenue Dinsdale Hamilton / NZ | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Coulson, Elizabeth Eve, et al Coulson & Rule 13 Whitehall Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Lambert, Peter Richard Motts Barn 103 A High Street Ibstock Leicestershire LE67 6LJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08741754.9 | 17.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008NZ00061 | Priority number, date | NZ20070553895 | 15.03.2007 Original published format: NZ 55389507 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008111863 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2137440 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/26, F16K11/02, F16B13/06, F16K11/07 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
F16K11/07 (EP,US);
F16K11/076 (EP,US);
F16K11/0856 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86517 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86863 (EP,US);
Y10T137/88022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER MENGENTEILER FÜR HYDRAULIKSCHALTUNGEN | [2010/01] | English: | IMPROVED FLOW DIVIDER FOR HYDRAULIC CIRCUITS | [2010/01] | French: | MEILLEUR DIVISEUR DE FLUX POUR CIRCUITS HYDRAULIQUES | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/34] | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.09.2013 | 31.03.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4553566 (BARCLAY JOHN A [US], et al); | [Y]EP0545486 (CLABER SPA [IT]); | [X]US6681805 (MCLANE ALLAN [US], et al); | [X]US2006054223 (BAUMGARTEN SVEN [DE], et al) |