|
19.05.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
366 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.04.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.05.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.10.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |