13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
08.04.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
13.11.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
03.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
09.05.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.04.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.04.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.12.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.12.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
05.12.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
28.11.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.06.2014 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.05.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.05.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2014 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.01.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.08.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
29.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.01.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.09.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.08.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.08.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
15.06.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
10.06.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.06.2011 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.09.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.08.2010 |
First examination report |
|
12.08.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.07.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.01.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] |
08.01.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] |
02.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|