Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2150912 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2015 | B1 | EP2150912 | 10.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US59827 | 10.04.2008 | US73986807 | 25.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008134216 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73986807 | 25.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8140439 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2012 | B2 | US2008270307 | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73986807 | 25.04.2007 |