EP2150912 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENABLING DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT IN FILE TRANSFERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states General instrument Corporation 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | ||
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states General instrument Corporation 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | ||
For all designated states Kitson, Frederick L. 1 Illinois Avenue Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US | |||
For all designated states Moroney, Paul 3411 Western Springs Road Olivenhain, CA 92024 / US | |||
For all designated states Peterka, Petr 5126 Caminito Vista Lujo San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
For all designated states Rzeszewski, Theodore S. 1315 Yorkshire Woods Wheaton, IL 60187 / US | |||
For all designated states Yacobellis, Robert H. 6807 North Greenview Avenue Chicago, IL 60626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSON, William L. 3540 North Wilshire Drive Palantine, IL 60067 / US | 02 /
ILDEREM, Vida 16211 South 14th Way Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US | 03 /
MOORE, Morris A. 2815 Demona Drive Austin, TX 78733 / US | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | ||
Former [2010/06] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08745437.7 | 10.04.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008US59827 | Priority number, date | US20070739868 | 25.04.2007 Original published format: US 739868 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008134216 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150912 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2150912 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/10 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
G06F21/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG AUSGEBILDET ZUR VERWALTUNG DIGITALER RECHTE BEI DATEIENÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2015/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENABLING DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT IN FILE TRANSFERS | [2010/06] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT LA GESTION DE DROITS NUMERIQUES DANS DES TRANSFERTS DE FICHIERS | [2010/06] |
Former [2010/06] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AKTIVIERUNG DER VERWALTUNG DIGITALER RECHTE BEI DATEIENÜBERTRAGUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.04.2008 | AT | 03.06.2015 | BE | 03.06.2015 | CY | 03.06.2015 | CZ | 03.06.2015 | DK | 03.06.2015 | EE | 03.06.2015 | ES | 03.06.2015 | FI | 03.06.2015 | HR | 03.06.2015 | IT | 03.06.2015 | LT | 03.06.2015 | LV | 03.06.2015 | MC | 03.06.2015 | NL | 03.06.2015 | PL | 03.06.2015 | RO | 03.06.2015 | SE | 03.06.2015 | SI | 03.06.2015 | SK | 03.06.2015 | TR | 03.06.2015 | BG | 03.09.2015 | NO | 03.09.2015 | GR | 04.09.2015 | IS | 03.10.2015 | PT | 06.10.2015 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 10.04.2008 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.04.2008 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6372974 (GROSS MARK T [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2003120943 (HUGHES DAVID [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005093989 (SMART INTERNET TECHNOLOGY CRC [AU], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [AP]WO2007086015 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [AP] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y] - CHEUN NGEN CHONG ET AL, "License Transfer in OMA-DRM", COMPUTER SECURITY - ESORICS 2006 LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BE, (20060101), vol. 4189, ISBN 978-3-540-44601-9, pages 81 - 96, XP019043224 [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * page 84 - page 91 * * page 94 - page 95 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11863908_6 | Examination | US2006161635 |