Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009079371 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1385907 | 14.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007019483 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007019472 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2011 | A8 | WO2007019472 | 15.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007019471 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8606552 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2013 | B2 | US2013043077 | 21.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US85726810 | 16.08.2010 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | US201213656527 | 19.10.2012 | US46289806 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8352221 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2013 | B2 | US2011077928 | 31.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46292906 | 07.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | US93815110 | 02.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8145465 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2012 | B2 | US2011015911 | 20.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46291806 | 07.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US89252310 | 28.09.2010 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | US1385907 | 14.12.2007 | US33382408 | 12.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8296115 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2012 | B2 | US2010300758 | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US85726810 | 16.08.2010 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | US46289806 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009229888 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | US46945209 | 20.05.2009 | US46289806 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7860696 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2010 | B2 | US2009090556 | 09.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46291806 | 07.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | US1385907 | 14.12.2007 | US33382408 | 12.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7860693 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2010 | B2 | US2007192074 | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US73706507 | 18.04.2007 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | US46289806 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7827014 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2010 | B2 | US2007032958 | 08.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46292906 | 07.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7729895 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2010 | B2 | US2007029113 | 08.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46291806 | 07.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7778777 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2010 | B2 | US2007029111 | 08.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | US46289806 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2281996 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | EP06800931 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2264275 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | EP06789544 | 08.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2258918 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US46945209 | 20.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2240881 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | A4 | EP2240881 | 20.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1385907 | 14.12.2007 | WO2008US86586 | 12.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1931858 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | WO2006US30804 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1931854 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US30830 | 07.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1929117 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | WO2006US30803 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2907330 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2017 | C | CA2907330 | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73706507 | 18.04.2007 | CA2684276 | 16.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2706343 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2016 | C | CA2706343 | 25.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1385907 | 14.12.2007 | WO2008US86586 | 12.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2684276 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2016 | C | CA2684276 | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73706507 | 18.04.2007 | WO2008US60468 | 16.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2625012 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2016 | C | CA2625012 | 15.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | WO2006US30804 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2625009 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2016 | C | CA2625009 | 15.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US30830 | 07.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008338627B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2014 | B2 | AU2008338627 | 25.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1385907 | 14.12.2007 | WO2008US86586 | 12.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2149104 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2015 | A4 | EP2149104 | 03.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73706507 | 18.04.2007 | WO2008US60468 | 16.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0810441 | 14.10.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US73706507 | 18.04.2007 | WO2008US60468 | 16.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0821259 | 16.06.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US1385907 | 14.12.2007 | WO2008US86586 | 12.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2624106 | 09.07.2013 | C | CA2624106 | 15.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | WO2006US30803 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2704718 | 20.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46945209 | 20.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2921128 | 15.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2625012 | 08.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112006002134T | 26.06.2008 | T5 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US30830 | 07.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112006002135T | 31.07.2008 | T5 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | WO2006US30804 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112006002137T | 26.06.2008 | T5 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | WO2006US30803 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2443125 | 08.02.2012 | B | GB2443125 | 23.04.2008 | A | GB0802299D0 | 12.03.2008 | D0 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US30830 | 07.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2443126 | 28.03.2012 | B | GB2443126 | 23.04.2008 | A | GB0802300D0 | 12.03.2008 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | WO2006US30803 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2443127 | 14.12.2011 | B | GB2443127 | 23.04.2008 | A | GB0802302D0 | 12.03.2008 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | WO2006US30804 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2483022 | 04.04.2012 | B | GB2483022 | 22.02.2012 | A | GB201120833D0 | 11.01.2012 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2482850 | 28.03.2012 | B | GB2482850 | 15.02.2012 | A | GB201121670D0 | 25.01.2012 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2482851 | 04.04.2012 | B | GB2482851 | 15.02.2012 | A | GB201121671D0 | 25.01.2012 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009011178 | 11.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73706507 | 18.04.2007 | WO2008US60468 | 16.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2010006477 | 04.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US1385907 | 14.12.2007 | WO2008US86586 | 12.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20081184L | 05.05.2008 | L | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | WO2006US30803 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20081185L | 05.05.2008 | L | Priority number | Date | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | WO2006US30804 | 07.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20081187L | 05.05.2008 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2006US30830 | 07.08.2006 | US70632105 | 08.08.2005 | US70632305 | 08.08.2005 | US73845305 | 21.11.2005 | US73843105 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008130997 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73706507 | 18.04.2007 |