EP2178557 - COMPOSITION OF TUMOUR-ASSOCIATED PEPTIDES AND RELATED ANTI-CANCER VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immatics Biotechnologies GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Harpreet Possartstraße 16 81679 München / DE | 02 /
SCHOOR, Oliver Charlottenstrasse 21 72070 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
TRAUTWEIN, Claudia Narzissenweg 4 42489 Wülfrath / DE | 04 /
HILF, Norbert Im Wengertacker 17 72138 Kirchentellinsfurt / DE | 05 /
WEINSCHENK, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | 06 /
WALTER, Steffen Steinenbergstrasse 2 72764 Reutlingen / DE | 07 /
LEWANDROWSKI, Peter Grabenstraße 11 72070 Tübingen-Hirschau / DE | [2013/50] |
Former [2013/43] | 01 /
SINGH, Harpreet Französische Allee 6 72072 Tübingen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHOOR, Oliver Charlottenstrasse 21 72070 Tübingen / DE | |||
03 /
TRAUTWEIN, Claudia Narzissenweg 4 42489 Wülfrath / DE | |||
04 /
HILF, Norbert Im Wengertacker 17 72138 Kirchentellinsfurt / DE | |||
05 /
WEINSCHENK, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | |||
06 /
WALTER, Steffen Steinenbergstrasse 2 72764 Reutlingen / DE | |||
07 /
LEWANDROWSKI, Peter Burgstrasse 14 72070 Tübingen-Hirschau / DE | |||
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
SINGH, Harpreet Französische Allee 6 72072 Tübingen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHOOR, Oliver Charlottenstrasse 21 72070 Tübingen / DE | |||
03 /
TRAUTWEIN, Claudia Nelkenweg 2 42489 Wülfrath / DE | |||
04 /
HILF, Norbert Im Wengertacker 17 72138 Kirchentellinsfurt / DE | |||
05 /
WEINSCHENK, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | |||
06 /
WALTER, Steffen Steinenbergstrasse 2 72764 Reutlingen / DE | |||
07 /
LEWANDROWSKI, Peter Burgstrasse 14 72070 Tübingen-Hirschau / DE | |||
Former [2010/17] | 01 /
SINGH, Harpreet Französische Allee 6 72072 Tübingen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHOOR, Oliver Charlottenstrasse 21 72070 Tübingen / DE | |||
03 /
TRAUTWEIN, Claudia Nelkenweg 2 42489 Wülfrath / DE | |||
04 /
HILF, Norbert Im Wengertacker 17 72138 Kirchentellinsfurt / DE | |||
05 /
WEINSCHENK, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | |||
06 /
WALTER, Steffen Steinenbergstrasse 2 72764 Reutlingen / DE | |||
07 /
LEWANDROWSKI, Peter Landhaushöhe 4 72070 Tübingen-Unterjesingen / DE | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/17] | Krauss, Jan Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08785105.1 | 25.07.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008EP06152 | Priority number, date | EP20070014796 | 27.07.2007 Original published format: EP 07014796 | US20070953109P | 31.07.2007 Original published format: US 953109 P | US20070981241P | 19.10.2007 Original published format: US 981241 P | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009015841 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2178557 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2178557 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61P35/00, A61K38/08, A61K38/16 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K38/193 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4615 (EP,US);
A61K39/4622 (EP,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,US);
A61K39/464482 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/193, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2010/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 11.02.2010 | BA | 11.02.2010 | MK | 11.02.2010 | RS | 11.02.2010 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON TUMORASSOZIIERTEN PEPTIDEN UND VERWANDTER IMPFSTOFF GEGEN KREBS | [2010/17] | English: | COMPOSITION OF TUMOUR-ASSOCIATED PEPTIDES AND RELATED ANTI-CANCER VACCINE | [2010/17] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PEPTIDES ASSOCIÉS À DES TUMEURS ET VACCIN ANTI-CANCER CONNEXE | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12187307.9 / EP2567707 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2008 | AT | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | ES | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | IT | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | NL | 01.03.2017 | PL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | SE | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | TR | 01.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | GB | 25.07.2017 | IE | 25.07.2017 | LU | 25.07.2017 | MT | 25.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | FR | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.07.2008 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 25.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
MT | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.07.2008 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 25.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
MT | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 25.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
MT | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 25.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
MT | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 25.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 25.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 25.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
FR | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 25.07.2017 | ||
IE | 25.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 25.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2006027693 ; | [Y]US2002102544 (MACK DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]US2003017167 (JIANG YUQIU [US]); | [A]WO03025138 (EOS BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al); | [A]US2003109690 (RUBEN STEVEN M [US], et al); | [Y]US6623923 (XU JIANGCHUN [US], et al); | [A]EP1760089 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) |