18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
21.12.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
13.01.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
18.10.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.10.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.07.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
12.07.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
04.02.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
06.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|