Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009157024 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IT00432 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011275030 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IT00432 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5131716B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2013 | B2 | JP2011525838 | 29.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008IT00432 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2291139 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2012 | B1 | EP2291139 | 09.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IT00432 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE545382T | 15.03.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IT00432 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2378915T | 19.04.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IT00432 | 26.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1398259 | 22.02.2013 | B1 | ITFI20090128 | 27.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IT00432 | 26.06.2008 | ITFI20090128 | 09.06.2009 |