EP2291139 - DENTAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leone S.p.A. Via Ponte a Quaracchi 50 50019 Sesto Fiorentino (Firenze) / IT | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLFI, Maurizio Via N. Pisano 9 I-50143 Firenze / IT | 02 /
SCOMMEGNA, Gabriele Via Grandi 47 I-50029 Tavarnuzze Impruneta (FI) / IT | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Strasser, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 14 85521 Ottobrunn-Riemerling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Strasser, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz Rosenheimer Landstrasse 87 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Strasser, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz Rosenheimer Landstrasse 87 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Application number, filing date | 08790021.3 | 26.06.2008 | [2011/10] | WO2008IT00432 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009157024 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2291139 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2291139 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
A61C8/005 (EP,US);
A61C8/006 (EP,US);
A61C8/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | ZAHNIMPLANTAT | [2011/10] | English: | DENTAL IMPLANT | [2011/10] | French: | IMPLANT DENTAIRE | [2011/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 26.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2008 | AT | 15.02.2012 | CY | 15.02.2012 | CZ | 15.02.2012 | DK | 15.02.2012 | EE | 15.02.2012 | FI | 15.02.2012 | HR | 15.02.2012 | IT | 15.02.2012 | LT | 15.02.2012 | LV | 15.02.2012 | MT | 15.02.2012 | PL | 15.02.2012 | RO | 15.02.2012 | SI | 15.02.2012 | SK | 15.02.2012 | BG | 15.05.2012 | NO | 15.05.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | IS | 15.06.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | GB | 26.06.2012 | IE | 26.06.2012 | LU | 26.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
GB | 26.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
LU | 26.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
GB | 26.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
GB | 26.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
GB | 26.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 15.02.2012 | |
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 15.02.2012 | |
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 15.02.2012 | |
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0308738 (RICHTER ERNST JURGEN DR MED DE) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 2-34 ** figure - *; | [A]US6419492 (SCHROERING ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 55 * * figures 7-12 *; | [DA]EP1554988 (LEONE SPA [IT]) [DA] 1-4 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0024] - [0027] * * figure - * |