20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
24.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
01.01.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] |
28.11.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
10.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
30.01.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
21.01.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.01.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.01.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.09.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.09.2014 |
Change - French title |
published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
30.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.11.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.11.2012 |
New entry: Request for decision: result |
|
12.11.2012 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.11.2012 |
New entry: Request for decision: receipt of request |
|
26.10.2012 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.09.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.11.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.03.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.01.2011 |
First examination report |
|
04.01.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.11.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.04.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
23.04.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
04.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|