Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7946595 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2011 | B2 | US2010164188 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP07487 | 11.09.2008 | DE102007043030 | 11.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5602631B | Global Dossier | 08.10.2014 | B2 | JP2010538844 | 16.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP07487 | 11.09.2008 | DE102007043030 | 11.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2188084 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2015 | B1 | EP2188084 | 26.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP07487 | 11.09.2008 | DE102007043030 | 11.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2696293 | 19.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP07487 | 11.09.2008 | DE102007043030 | 11.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101842180 | 22.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP07487 | 11.09.2008 | DE102007043030 | 11.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009033686 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007043030 | 11.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102007043030 | 12.11.2009 | B4 | DE102007043030 | 12.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007043030 | 11.09.2007 |