EP2188084 - TOOL HOLDER AND MEASURING SENSOR HAVING A TOOL HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states m & h inprocess messtechnik GmbH Am Langholz 11 88289 Waldburg / DE | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADLENER, Wolfgang Königsberger Strasse 12 88212 Ravensburg / DE | 02 /
VEIL, Wilfried Schornreuteweg 15 88212 Ravensburg / DE | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Dobler, Markus Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | ||
Former [2010/21] | Dobler, Markus Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08802047.4 | 11.09.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008EP07487 | Priority number, date | DE20071043030 | 11.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007043030 | [2010/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009033686 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2188084 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2188084 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/00, B23B51/00, B23Q3/12 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
B23B31/006 (EP,US);
Y10T279/34 (EP,US);
Y10T279/3493 (EP,US);
Y10T279/35 (EP,US);
Y10T409/309408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGAUFNAHME SOWIE MESSTASTER MIT EINER WERKZEUGAUFNAHME | [2010/21] | English: | TOOL HOLDER AND MEASURING SENSOR HAVING A TOOL HOLDER | [2010/21] | French: | PORTE-OUTIL ET SONDE DE MESURE DOTEE D'UN PORTE-OUTIL | [2014/42] |
Former [2010/21] | PORTE-OUTIL ET SONDE DE MESURE DOTÉE D'UN PORTE-OUTIL | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 12.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2012 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 19.11.2012 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 22.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2008 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | AT | 11.09.2015 | IE | 11.09.2015 | LU | 11.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 11.09.2008 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 11.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/17] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 11.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2006043170 (JOBS SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 2, line 6 - line 12 ** page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102006039258 (MADLENER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | DE4009461 | EP1084782 |