18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
07.09.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
08.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
01.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
21.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
30.09.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
29.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.04.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.04.2011 |
Change - German title |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
22.04.2011 |
Change - English title |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
22.04.2011 |
Change - French title |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
12.11.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
30.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
14.05.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
27.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|