Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9479558 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2016 | B2 | US2015295975 | 15.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67673610 | 24.03.2010 | WO2008EP61721 | 04.09.2008 | US201514793034 | 07.07.2015 | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | US201313973287 | 22.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9106722 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2015 | B2 | US2013336219 | 19.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67673610 | 24.03.2010 | WO2008EP61721 | 04.09.2008 | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | US201313973287 | 22.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8543119 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2013 | B2 | US2010311425 | 09.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP61721 | 04.09.2008 | US67673608 | 04.09.2008 | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2698443 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2016 | C | CA2698443 | 02.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP61721 | 04.09.2008 | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2196066 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2011 | B1 | EP2196066 | 16.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP61721 | 04.09.2008 | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE532377T | 15.11.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP61721 | 04.09.2008 | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101953218B | 13.11.2013 | B | CN101953218 | 19.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP61721 | 04.09.2008 | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2376294T | 04.04.2012 | T8 | ES2376294T | 12.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP61721 | 04.09.2008 | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ583488 | 28.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP61721 | 04.09.2008 | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2196066T | 30.04.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP61721 | 04.09.2008 | EP08803691 | 04.09.2008 | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009040230 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2196066E | 06.02.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | US97010307 | 05.09.2007 |