EP2196066 - Dynamic transcoder placement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/24] | DYNAMIC TRANSCODER PLACEMENT | ||
[2011/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMPMANN, Dirk Jos Francotteweg 50 NL-6291 GP Vaals / NL | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Tonscheidt, Andreas, et al Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 D-52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Tonscheidt, Andreas, et al Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 D-52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 08803691.8 | 04.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008EP61721 | Priority number, date | US20070970103P | 05.09.2007 Original published format: US 970103 P | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009040230 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196066 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2196066 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02, H04M7/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
H04M7/0072 (EP,US);
H04L65/75 (US);
H04W88/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | Dynamische Transkoder-Platzierung | [2011/21] | English: | Dynamic transcoder placement | [2011/21] | French: | Placement d'un transcodeur dynamique | [2011/21] |
Former [2010/24] | DYNAMISCHE TRANSKODER-PLATZIERUNG | ||
Former [2010/24] | DYNAMIC TRANSCODER PLACEMENT | ||
Former [2010/24] | PLACEMENT D'UN TRANSCODEUR DYNAMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 05.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2008 | AT | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | HR | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | NO | 02.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0070885 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-14 * pages 14,15 *; | [XA]US2005013281 (MILTON LEWIS J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0013] , [0015] - [0021] - [0024] , [0026] , [0039] , [0040] , [0043] , [0044]; figure 2c * [A] 2-4,6,7,9-11,13,14; | [A]US2005037790 (CHANG YONG [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0009] , [0017] , [0018] , [0055] , [0057] *; | [XA]EP1553790 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,8,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0008] - [0011] - [0013] , [0016] - [0018]; claims 4-7 * [A] 2-4,6,7,9-11,13,14; | [A]WO2005096585 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * pages 3-6 *; | [PX] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group GERAN;A-interface over IP Study (AINTIP);(Release 8)", 3GPP DRAFT; 43903-002, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071114), vol. tsg_geran\TSG_GERAN\GERAN_36_Vancouver\Docs, no. Vancouver; 20071112, XP050018929 [PX] 1-14 * pages 13,32-34 * | [X] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Bandwidth And Resource Savings (BARS) and speech enhancements for Circuit Switched (CS) networks (3GPP TR 23.977 version 7.0.0 Release 7); ETSI TR 123 977", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20070601), vol. 3-SA2, no. V7.0.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014037489 [X] 1-14 * pages 31,32 * * pages 37-42 * |