EP2197789 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A DISPERSION COMPRISING TITANIUM-SILICON MIXED OXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORTZ, Wolfgang Feldstr. 9 63607 Wächtersbach / DE | 02 /
SCHUMACHER, Kai Bahnstr. 30 65719 Hofheim / DE | 03 /
PIETSCH, Jörg Kälberauerstrasse 16a 63755 Alzenau / DE | [2010/25] | Application number, filing date | 08804730.3 | 25.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008EP62833 | Priority number, date | DE20071049742 | 16.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007049742 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009050013 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2197789 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/141, C01B37/00 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
C01B33/141 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B33/1415 (EP,US);
C01B33/1417 (EP,US);
C01B37/005 (EP,US);
C01G23/04 (EP,US);
C01G23/047 (EP,US);
C01P2002/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/19 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER TITAN-SILICIUM-MISCHOXID ENTHALTENDEN DISPERSION | [2010/25] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A DISPERSION COMPRISING TITANIUM-SILICON MIXED OXIDE | [2010/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE DISPERSION COMPRENANT DE L'OXYDE MIXTE DE SILICIUM ET DE TITANE | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 22.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.03.2012 | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/31] | 20.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.03.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO0240399 (CABOT CORP [US]) [I] 1 * claims 1-9,28-30,33-36,41,42 * * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 3, paragraph 14 * * page 4, paragraph 17 * * page 5, paragraphs 23,24 * * page 6, paragraphs 25,26,27 * * page 8, paragraph 35 - page 9, paragraph 38 *; | [AD]EP0814058 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |