EP2191856 - BLOOD PURIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikkiso Company Limited 43-2, Ebisu 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8677 / JP | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Tomoya c/o Nikkiso Company Limited 498-1 Shizutani Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | 02 /
TOYODA, Masahiro c/o Nikkiso Company Limited 498-1 Shizutani Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | 03 /
AGATA, Akari c/o Nikkiso Company Limited 498-1 Shizutani Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | [2013/45] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Tomoya c/o Nikkiso Company Limited 498-1 Shizutani Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | ||
02 /
TOYODA, Masahiro c/o Nikkiso Company Limited 498-1 Shizutani Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | |||
03 /
AGATA, Akari c/o Nikkiso Company Limited 498-1 Shizutani Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | GROSSE SCHUMACHER KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/22] | Grosse, Wolfgang Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08827749.6 | 20.08.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008JP02241 | Priority number, date | JP20070215540 | 22.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007215540 | [2010/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009025084 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2191856 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2191856 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/14, A61M1/36 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
A61M1/3653 (EP,US);
A61M1/361 (EP,US);
A61M1/3612 (EP,US);
A61M1/3658 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/22] | A61M1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | BLUTREINIGER | [2010/22] | English: | BLOOD PURIFIER | [2010/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION SANGUINE | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2010 | Translation filed | 17.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 09.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.08.2008 | AT | 06.11.2013 | BE | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | ES | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | HR | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | NL | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | NO | 06.02.2014 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.08.2008 | |
AT | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | |
NO | 06.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH11253549 (NISSHO KK, et al) [A] 1-10 * , Claim 1; Par. No. [0006] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000502940 (Hospal AG.) [A] 1-10* , Claim 1 & US 2002/0062098 A1 & EP 1449549 A2 & WO 1998/017334 A1 *; | [A]JP2001506873 (In-Line Diagnostics Corp.) [A] 1-10 * , Claims 1 to 2; page 11, lines 1 to 5; Fig. 1 & WO 1998/017193 A1 & US 6117099 A *; | [A]JP2005253768 (NIPRO CORP) [A] 1-10 * , Claim 2; Par. Nos. [0023], [0025]; Figs. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006087907 (NIKKISO CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , Claims 1 to 6; Par. Nos. [0028] to [0029]; Figs. 1 to 6 & WO 2006/022099 A1 & US 2006/0043007 A1 & EP 1790363 A1 *; | [A]JP2007105149 (NIKKISO CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , Claims 1, 6; Par. Nos. [0027] to [0028]; Figs. 1 to 6 & WO 2007/043237 A & US 2007/0083145 A1 *; | [A]JP2007105148 (NIKKISO CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , Claims 1, 4; Par. Nos. [0024] to [0025]; Figs. 1 to 6 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2000502940 |