Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011160088 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97307907 | 17.09.2007 | WO2008IB03808 | 17.09.2008 | US59971908 | 17.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8975215 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2015 | B2 | US2010210024 | 19.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97307907 | 17.09.2007 | WO2008IB03808 | 17.09.2008 | US61923309 | 16.11.2009 | US59971909 | 11.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010539468 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US97307907 | 17.09.2007 | WO2008IB03808 | 17.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2191267 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2010 | A4 | EP2191267 | 02.06.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US97307907 | 17.09.2007 | WO2008IB03808 | 17.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101821617 | 01.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US97307907 | 17.09.2007 | WO2008IB03808 | 17.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009037600 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2009 | A3 | WO2009037600 | 26.03.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US97307907 | 17.09.2007 |