|
11.11.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.09.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2014 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
14 |